Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vincenzo Cavalli (Gaballi)

Deceased

Bishop of Bertinoro, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Mar 1647Born
23 Mar 167628.9AppointedBishop of Bertinoro, Italy
19 Apr 167629.0Ordained BishopBishop of Bertinoro, Italy
Jun 1701³54.1DiedBishop of Bertinoro, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Vincenzo Cavalli (Gaballi)
Bishop Vincenzo Cavalli (Gaballi) (born , died Jun 1701) Bishop of Bertinoro

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRavenna

  • a bishop for 25.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 126
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1676, Number 8

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast