Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michele Maria Dentice

Deceased

Bishop of Mottola (Motula)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Jan 1660BornNapoli
14 Mar 168222.1Ordained DeaconDeacon
3 Apr 168323.2Ordained PriestPriest
27 Mar 169737.1AppointedBishop of Mottola (Motula), Italy
8 Apr 169737.2Ordained BishopBishop of Mottola (Motula), Italy
Oct 1698³38.7DiedBishop of Mottola (Motula), Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Michele Maria Dentice:
Bishop Michele Maria Dentice (born , died Oct 1698) Bishop of Mottola (Motula)

  • a priest for 15.4 years
  • a bishop for 1.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 276
  • ob/c2+: CB, 12 May 2013
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1697, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 2 May 2015