Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Eugene Jerome Cooney

Bishop Emeritus of Nelson, British Columbia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Dec 1931 BornMedicine Hat
4 Jun 196028.5Ordained PriestPriest
15 Mar 199664.2AppointedBishop of Nelson, British Columbia, Canada
11 Jun 199664.5Ordained BishopBishop of Nelson, British Columbia, Canada
13 Jun 199664.5InstalledBishop of Nelson, British Columbia, Canada
30 Nov 200775.9RetiredBishop of Nelson, British Columbia, Canada

MicroData Summary for Eugene Jerome Cooney:
Bishop Eugene Jerome Cooney (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Nelson

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Nelson.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 30 Nov 2007
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 146, Number 12,759

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.4, 11 Nov 2013; data: 24 Dec 2013