Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ernesto Coppo, S.D.B. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Kimberley in Western Australia

Titular Bishop of Palaeopolis in Asia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Feb 1870BornRosignano Monferrato, Italy
7 Aug 189222.5Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
1 Dec 192252.8AppointedVicar Apostolic of Kimberley in Western Australia
1 Dec 192252.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Palaeopolis in Asia
24 Dec 192252.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Palaeopolis in Asia
1928²57.9ResignedVicar Apostolic of Kimberley in Western Australia
28 Dec 194878.9DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Kimberley in Western Australia

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ernesto Coppo:
Bishop Ernesto Coppo S.D.B. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Kimberley in Western Australia

  • a priest for 56.4 years
  • a bishop for 26.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: JPG
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 111
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1922, Number 81

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013