Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Edoardo Pulciano

Deceased

Archbishop of Genova


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Nov 1852BornTorino
22 May 187522.5Ordained PriestPriest
14 Mar 188734.3AppointedBishop of Casale Monferrato, Italy
15 May 188734.5Ordained BishopBishop of Casale Monferrato, Italy
11 Jul 189239.6AppointedBishop of Novara, Italy
16 Dec 190149.1AppointedArchbishop of Genova, Italy
25 Dec 191159.1DiedArchbishop of Genova, Italy

MicroData Summary for Edoardo Pulciano:
Archbishop Edoardo Pulciano (born , died ) Archbishop of Genova

  • a priest for 36.6 years
  • a bishop for 24.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 187, and Page 316
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 420

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013