Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop St. Luigi Versiglia, S.D.B. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Shiuchow [Shaoguan], China

Titular Bishop of Carystus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Jun 1873Born
188814.5ProfessedMember of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
21 Dec 189522.5Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
22 Apr 192046.8AppointedVicar Apostolic of Shiuchow [Shaoguan], China
22 Apr 192046.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Carystus
9 Jan 192147.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Carystus
25 Feb 193056.7DiedVicar Apostolic of Shiuchow [Shaoguan], China
15 May 1983Beatified
1 Oct 2000Canonized

MicroData Summary for St. Luigi Versiglia
Bishop St. Luigi Versiglia S.D.B. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Shiuchow [Shaoguan]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOliva Gessi, Italy

  • a priest for 34.1 years
  • a bishop for 9.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1921, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast