Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Broome

Dioecesis Broomensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Elevated: 7 June 1966
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Perth
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Australia
  • Square Kilometers: 77,300 (29,857 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: http://www.broomediocese.org/
  • Mailing Address: Bishop's House, P.O. Box 76, 13 Barker St., Broome, W.A. 6725, Australia
  • Telephone: (08)91.921.060
  • Fax: 91.922.136

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Vicariate Apostolic of Kimberley in Western Australia
10 May 1887ErectedDiocese of Perth Vicariate Apostolic of Kimberley in Western Australia (erected)
4 May 1910Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Kimberley in Western Australia Mission "Sui Iuris" of Drisdale River (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Kimberleys
13 November 1959Name ChangedVicariate Apostolic of Kimberley in Western Australia Vicariate Apostolic of Kimberleys
Diocese of Broome
7 June 1966ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Kimberleys Diocese of Broome
1980Territory AddedMission "Sui Iuris" of Kalumburu (suppressed) Diocese of Broome

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Vicariate Apostolic of Kimberley in Western Australia
19491,0909,00012.1%8813618225ap1951
Vicariate Apostolic of Kimberleys
Diocese of Broome
19662,90012,00024.2%111126318419ap1967
19682,80020,00014.0%1101125417458ap1971
19805,73017,94431.9%2796361644ap1981
19907,31124,50229.8%4812609244210ap1991
19999,01633,53726.9%571275116508ap2000
20009,02033,55026.9%671369316518ap2001
20019,02033,55026.9%561182014368ap2002
20029,47036,50025.9%561186015518ap2003
20039,35133,70527.7%661277913428ap2004
200413,74030,90044.5%65111,24912398ap2005
200613,40235,00138.3%67131,03014339ap2007
201214,05041,00034.3%73101,4059189ap2013

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v3.0.0, 8 Mar 2014; data: 8 Jul 2014