Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Michel-Gaspard Coppenrath

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Papeete, French Polynesia, Pacific (Oceania)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Jun 1924Born
29 Jun 195430.0Ordained PriestPriest of Tahiti {Isole Tahiti}, French Polynesia, Pacific (Oceania)
16 Feb 196843.6AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Papeete, French Polynesia, Pacific (Oceania)
16 Feb 196843.6AppointedTitular Archbishop of Tigisi in Numidia
3 Jun 196843.9Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Tigisi in Numidia
5 Mar 197348.7SucceededArchbishop of Papeete, French Polynesia, Pacific (Oceania)
4 Jun 199975.0RetiredArchbishop of Papeete, French Polynesia, Pacific (Oceania)
16 Aug 200884.1DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Papeete, French Polynesia, Pacific (Oceania)

MicroData Summary for Michel-Gaspard Coppenrath
Archbishop Michel-Gaspard Coppenrath (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Papeete

EventPlace
Birth PlacePapeete, Vicariate Apostolic of Tahiti {Isole Tahiti}, French Polynesia
Ordained BishopPapeete, Archdiocese of Papeete, French Polynesia

  • a priest for 54.1 years
  • a bishop for 40.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 196, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 6, Number 299

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast