Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Taiohae o Tefenuaenata

Dioecesis Taiohaënus seu Humanae Telluris



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Name Changed: 31 May 1974
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Papeete
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: French Polynesia
  • Region: Pacific (Oceania)
  • Square Kilometers: 1,250 (482 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Eveche, B.P. 10, 98742 Taiohae, Nuku-Hiva, Iles Marquises, Polynesie Francaise
  • Telephone: 920.352
  • Fax: 920.288

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Vicariate Apostolic of Marquesas Islands {Isole Marchesi}
9 May 1848ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Marquesas Islands {Isole Marchesi} (erected)
Diocese of Taiohae
21 June 1966ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Marquesas Islands {Isole Marchesi} Diocese of Taiohae
Diocese of Taiohae o Tefenuaenata
31 May 1974Name ChangedDiocese of Taiohae Diocese of Taiohae o Tefenuaenata

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Vicariate Apostolic of Marquesas Islands {Isole Marchesi}
19502,8003,20987.3%55560610ap1951
Diocese of Taiohae
19694,9285,42690.8%66821696ap1971
Diocese of Taiohae o Tefenuaenata
19805,1105,58091.6%441,277876ap1981
19906,7657,51090.1%1561,1271074ap1991
19997,4708,31089.9%1451,494858ap2000
20007,5758,42090.0%1561,262858ap2001
20017,6158,45590.1%1561,269858ap2002
20027,7208,58090.0%1561,286854ap2003
20037,8208,71089.8%1341,955658ap2004
20047,9308,81590.0%1341,9826426ap2005
20108,3109,22090.1%2351,6628526ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.8.9, 26 Feb 2013; data: 25 Mar 2013