Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Guy André Dominique Marie Chevalier, SS.CC.

Bishop of Taiohae o Tefenuaenata, French Polynesia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 May 1938 BornLes Herbiers, France
27 Jun 196426.1Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Sacred Hearts of Jesus and Mary
29 Mar 198546.8AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Taiohae o Tefenuaenata, French Polynesia, Pacific (Oceania)
15 Aug 198547.2Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Taiohae o Tefenuaenata, French Polynesia, Pacific (Oceania)
31 May 198648.0SucceededBishop of Taiohae o Tefenuaenata, French Polynesia, Pacific (Oceania)

MicroData Summary for Guy André Dominique Marie Chevalier:
Bishop Guy André Dominique Marie Chevalier SS.CC. (born ) Bishop of Taiohae o Tefenuaenata

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Taiohae o Tefenuaenata.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013