Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pierre-Marie-David Le Cadre, SS.CC. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Marquesas Islands {Isole Marchesi}, French Polynesia

Titular Bishop of Demetrias


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Aug 1875BornQuestembert, France
29 Jul 190024.9Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Sacred Hearts of Jesus and Mary
30 Dec 192045.3AppointedVicar Apostolic of Marquesas Islands {Isole Marchesi}, French Polynesia, Pacific (Oceania)
5 Jan 192145.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Demetrias
4 Sep 192146.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Demetrias
21 Nov 195277.2DiedVicar Apostolic of Marquesas Islands {Isole Marchesi}, French Polynesia, Pacific (Oceania)

MicroData Summary for Pierre-Marie-David Le Cadre:
Bishop Pierre-Marie-David Le Cadre SS.CC. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Marquesas Islands {Isole Marchesi}

  • a priest for 52.3 years
  • a bishop for 31.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1921, Number 66

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013