Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop William Joseph Wright

Bishop of Maitland-Newcastle, Australia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Oct 1952 Born
20 Aug 197724.8Ordained PriestPriest of Sydney, Australia
4 Apr 201158.4AppointedBishop of Maitland-Newcastle, Australia
15 Jun 201158.6Ordained BishopBishop of Maitland-Newcastle, Australia

MicroData Summary for William Joseph Wright
Bishop William Joseph Wright (born ) Bishop of Maitland-Newcastle

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWashington, DC, USA

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Maitland-Newcastle.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 4 Apr 2011
  • ob/c2+: CB, 12 Jun 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 206, Number 17,077

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast