Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Philip Edward Wilson

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Adelaide, Australia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Oct 1950Born
23 Aug 197524.8Ordained PriestPriest of Maitland, Australia
12 Apr 199645.5AppointedBishop of Wollongong, Australia
10 Jul 199645.7Ordained BishopBishop of Wollongong, Australia
30 Nov 200050.1AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Adelaide, Australia
3 Dec 200151.1SucceededArchbishop of Adelaide, Australia
30 Jul 201867.8ResignedArchbishop of Adelaide, Australia
17 Jan 202170.2DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Adelaide, Australia

MicroData Summary for Philip Edward Wilson (VIAF: 3885151247991544270005)
Archbishop Philip Edward Wilson (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Adelaide

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCessnock
Ordained BishopBHP Sports Stadium, Unanderra
Death PlaceAdelaide, Archdiocese of Adelaide

  • a priest for 45.4 years
  • a bishop for 24.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 146, Number 12,774
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 220, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • r: Bollettino, 30 Jul 2018
  • d: CB, 17 Jan 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.1, 10 Dec 2020; Data: 17 Jan 2021

Quantcast