Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch Egidio (Carlo) Colonna, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Titular Patriarch of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme}, Palestine


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1607²Born
4 Dec 163831.9ProfessedMember of Order of Saint Benedict
19 Dec 164336.9AppointedTitular Archbishop of Amasea
3 Jan 164437.0Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Amasea
19 Jan 167164.0AppointedTitular Patriarch of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme}, Palestine
11 Oct 168679.7DiedTitular Patriarch of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme}, Palestine

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Egidio (Carlo) Colonna (VIAF: 62606958)
Patriarch Egidio (Carlo) Colonna O.S.B. (born 1607, died ) Titular Patriarch of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Ordained BishopSant’Egidio in Trastevere, Church, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Buried Place (Original)San Callisto, Church, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a bishop for 42.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 220
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 80
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1643, Number 31
  • mn/bd: AT, 20 Jan 2017
  • b/c2: AT, 17 Oct 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 24 Oct 2018

Quantcast