Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Johann Eberhard Cardinal Nidhard (Neidhardt), S.J. †

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Croce in Gerusalemme


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Dec 1607Born
24 Aug 167163.7Elevated to CardinalIn Pectore
16 Nov 167163.9AppointedTitular Archbishop of Edessa in Osrhoëne
24 Jan 167264.1Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Edessa in Osrhoëne
16 May 167264.4Elevated to Cardinal
8 Aug 167264.6InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Bartolomeo all’Isola
25 Sep 167971.7AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Croce in Gerusalemme
1 Feb 168173.1DiedCardinal-Priest of Santa Croce in Gerusalemme

MicroData Summary for Johann Eberhard Nidhard (Neidhardt)
Johann Eberhard Cardinal Nidhard (Neidhardt) S.J. (born , died ) Cardinal-Priest of Santa Croce in Gerusalemme

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFalkenstein

  • a bishop for 9.0 years
  • a cardinal for 9.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 24 Aug 1671
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 208, Number 1,299
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1672, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast