Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Baltasar de los Reyes, O.S.H. †

Deceased

Bishop of Coria, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1606²Born
30 Jan 166862.0AppointedBishop of Orense, Spain
6 May 166862.3Ordained BishopBishop of Orense, Spain
30 Jan 167367.0AppointedBishop of Coria, Spain
5 May 167367.3DiedBishop of Coria, Spain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Baltasar de los Reyes
Bishop Baltasar de los Reyes O.S.H. (born 1606, died ) Bishop of Coria

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRiaza

  • a bishop for 4.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 202, Number 1,268
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1668, Number 14

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast