Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Miguel de Cárdenas, O. Carm. †

Deceased

Bishop of Ciudad Rodrigo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1596²BornMadrid
18 Jul 166771.5AppointedBishop of Ciudad Rodrigo, Spain
13 May 166872.3Ordained BishopBishop of Ciudad Rodrigo, Spain
22 Feb 167175.1DiedBishop of Ciudad Rodrigo, Spain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Miguel de Cárdenas:
Bishop Miguel de Cárdenas O. Carm. (died ) Bishop of Ciudad Rodrigo

  • a bishop for 2.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 159
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 203, Number 1,269
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 151
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1668, Number 17

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 7 Apr 2015