Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Diego de Silva y Pacheco, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Astorga, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1606²Born
28 Feb 166862.1AppointedBishop of Guadix, Spain
6 May 166862.3Ordained BishopBishop of Guadix, Spain
27 May 167569.4AppointedBishop of Astorga, Spain
22 Mar 167771.2DiedBishop of Astorga, Spain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Diego de Silva y Pacheco
Bishop Diego de Silva y Pacheco O.S.B. (born 1606, died ) Bishop of Astorga

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSantiago de Compostela

  • a bishop for 8.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 102, and Page 214
  • bp/bd/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 135
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 202, Number 1,267
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1668, Number 15

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast