Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Gambacorta, C.R. †

Deceased

Bishop of Marsico Nuovo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1613BornLimatola
23 Mar 167663.2AppointedBishop of Marsico Nuovo, Italy
26 Apr 167663.3Ordained BishopBishop of Marsico Nuovo, Italy
25 May 168370.4DiedBishop of Marsico Nuovo, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Gambacorta:
Bishop Giovanni Gambacorta C.R. (died ) Bishop of Marsico Nuovo

  • a bishop for 7.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 258

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013