Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Franz Karl Eusebius von Waldburg-Friedberg und Trauchburg

Deceased

Bishop of Chiemsee, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Aug 1701Born
1 May 174644.6SelectedBishop of Chiemsee, Germany
13 Aug 174644.9ConfirmedBishop of Chiemsee, Germany
14 Aug 174644.9Ordained BishopBishop of Chiemsee, Germany
6 Jul 177270.8DiedBishop of Chiemsee, Germany

MicroData Summary for Franz Karl Eusebius von Waldburg-Friedberg und Trauchburg
Bishop Franz Karl Eusebius von Waldburg-Friedberg und Trauchburg (born , died ) Bishop of Chiemsee

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDürmentingen

  • a bishop for 25.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Number 16,129
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1746, Number 31
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 163

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast