Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ferdinand-Marie de Lobkowitz

Deceased

Bishop of Gent {Ghent, Gand}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Jan 1726BornVienna, Austria
20 Dec 175024.9Ordained DeaconDeacon
21 Jan 175125.0Ordained PriestPriest
22 Nov 177145.8SelectedBishop of Namur {Namen}, Belgium
30 Mar 177246.1ConfirmedBishop of Namur {Namen}, Belgium
10 May 177246.3Ordained BishopBishop of Namur {Namen}, Belgium
1 Jul 177953.4SelectedBishop of Gent {Ghent, Gand}, Belgium
20 Sep 177953.6ConfirmedBishop of Gent {Ghent, Gand}, Belgium
29 Jan 179569.0DiedBishop of Gent {Ghent, Gand}, Belgium

MicroData Summary for Ferdinand-Marie de Lobkowitz:
Bishop Ferdinand-Marie de Lobkowitz (born , died ) Bishop of Gent {Ghent, Gand}

  • a priest for 44.0 years
  • a bishop for 22.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1789
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 223, and Page 300
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1772, Number 14

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 28 Dec 2015