Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Franziskus Xaver Cardinal von Salm-Reifferscheidt-Krautheim

Deceased

Bishop of Gurk


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Feb 1749BornWien, Austria
18 Jun 177526.3Ordained DeaconDeacon of Wien {Vienna}, Austria
25 Aug 177526.5Ordained PriestPriest of Wien {Vienna}, Austria
20 Nov 178334.8SelectedBishop of Gurk, Austria
24 Jul 178435.4ConfirmedBishop of Gurk, Austria
9 Aug 178435.5Ordained BishopBishop of Gurk, Austria
23 Sep 181667.6Elevated to Cardinal
19 Apr 182273.2DiedBishop of Gurk, Austria

MicroData Summary for Franziskus Xaver von Salm-Reifferscheidt-Krautheim
Franziskus Xaver Cardinal von Salm-Reifferscheidt-Krautheim (born , died ) Bishop of Gurk

  • a priest for 46.6 years
  • a bishop for 37.6 years
  • a cardinal for 5.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 232
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1784, Number 23

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 6 Mar 2016