Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop William Codd

Deceased

Bishop of Ferns, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jul 1864Born
1889²24.4Ordained PriestPriest of Ferns, Ireland
7 Dec 191753.4AppointedBishop of Ferns, Ireland
25 Feb 191853.6Ordained BishopBishop of Ferns, Ireland
12 Mar 193873.6DiedBishop of Ferns, Ireland

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for William Codd
Bishop William Codd (born , died ) Bishop of Ferns

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWexford

  • a priest for 49.1 years
  • a bishop for 20.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1937
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1939
  • op/ob: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1932
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1918, Number 12

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 6 Jul 2018

Quantcast