Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop James Downey, C.M. †

Deceased

Coadjutor Bishop of Ossory

Titular Bishop of Adada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Feb 1874BornArmagh
1899²24.9Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Mission
8 Aug 192248.5AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Ossory, Ireland
8 Aug 192248.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Adada
8 Oct 192248.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Adada
6 Apr 192753.2DiedCoadjutor Bishop of Ossory, Ireland

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for James Downey:
Bishop James Downey C.M. (born , died ) Coadjutor Bishop of Ossory

  • a priest for 28.3 years
  • a bishop for 4.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1927
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1928
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1922, Number 62

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013