Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francis Joseph Wall

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Dublin

Titular Bishop of Thasus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Oct 1866BornDublin, Ireland
1 Nov 188923.0Ordained PriestPriest
23 Jan 193164.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Dublin, Ireland
23 Jan 193164.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Thasus
26 May 193164.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thasus
16 May 194780.5DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Dublin, Ireland

MicroData Summary for Francis Joseph Wall:
Bishop Francis Joseph Wall (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Dublin

  • a priest for 57.5 years
  • a bishop for 15.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 113, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1931, Number 23

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015