Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Julio César Corniel Amaro

Bishop of Puerto Plata, Dominican Republic


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Sep 1958 Born
21 Jun 198627.7Ordained PriestPriest of San Francisco de Macorís, Dominican Republic
31 May 200546.6AppointedBishop of Puerto Plata, Dominican Republic
16 Jul 200546.8Ordained BishopBishop of Puerto Plata, Dominican Republic

MicroData Summary for Julio César Corniel Amaro
Bishop Julio César Corniel Amaro (born ) Bishop of Puerto Plata

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBodita

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Puerto Plata.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 181, Number 14,944

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast