Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Roland-François de Kerhoent de Coetenfao

Deceased

Bishop of Avranches


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Jan 1662BornSeglien
1689¹26.9Ordained PriestPriest
24 Apr 169937.2SelectedBishop of Avranches, France
5 Oct 169937.7ConfirmedBishop of Avranches, France
29 Nov 169937.8Ordained BishopBishop of Avranches, France
2 Oct 171957.7DiedBishop of Avranches, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Roland-François de Kerhoent de Coetenfao:
Bishop Roland-François de Kerhoent de Coetenfao (born , died ) Bishop of Avranches

  • a priest for 30.7 years
  • a bishop for 19.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 65
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1699, Number 29

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 9 May 2015