Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop James Browne

Deceased

Bishop of Ferns, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Aug 1842Born
25 Dec 186523.3Ordained PriestPriest of Ferns, Ireland
8 Jul 188441.8AppointedBishop of Ferns, Ireland
14 Sep 188442.0Ordained BishopBishop of Ferns, Ireland
21 Jun 191774.8DiedBishop of Ferns, Ireland

MicroData Summary for James Browne (VIAF: 108073137)
Bishop James Browne (born , died ) Bishop of Ferns

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMayglass, Diocese of Ferns
Ordained BishopEnniscorthy

  • a priest for 51.4 years
  • a bishop for 32.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1913
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1918
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 269
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1884, Number 45

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 21 Apr 2017