Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Gianfrancesco Cardinal Ginetti

Deceased

Archbishop of Fermo

Cardinal-Deacon of San Nicola in Carcere


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Dec 1626BornRoma
1 Sep 168154.7Elevated to Cardinal
22 Sep 168154.7InstalledCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria della Scala
12 Jan 168255.0AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Angelo in Pescheria
5 Jun 168457.4AppointedArchbishop of Fermo, Italy
11 Jun 168457.4Ordained BishopArchbishop of Fermo, Italy
28 Nov 168962.9AppointedCardinal-Deacon of San Nicola in Carcere
18 Sep 169164.7DiedArchbishop of Fermo, Italy

MicroData Summary for Gianfrancesco Ginetti:
Gianfrancesco Cardinal Ginetti (born , died ) Archbishop of Fermo

  • a bishop for 7.2 years
  • a cardinal for 10.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 1 Sep 1681
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1684, Number 13

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 21 Apr 2015