Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Lorenzo Cardinal Raggi

Deceased

Cardinal-Bishop of Palestrina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1615BornGenoa, Italy
7 Oct 164732.8Elevated to Cardinal
16 Dec 164733.0InstalledCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Domnica
21 Jul 165338.6AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Angelo in Pescheria
30 Aug 166045.7AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Eustachio
11 Feb 166449.1AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Quirico e Giulitta
6 Feb 167964.1AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Damaso
8 Jan 168065.0AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Palestrina
14 Jan 168065.0Ordained BishopBishop of Palestrina
14 Jan 168772.0DiedCardinal-Bishop of Palestrina

MicroData Summary for Lorenzo Raggi:
Cardinal Lorenzo Raggi (died ) Cardinal-Bishop of Palestrina

  • a bishop for 7.0 years
  • a cardinal for 39.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 7 Oct 1647

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013