Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Angelus Veniero (Venerius)

Deceased

Bishop of Tinos


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1634BornCreten
27 Mar 165824.2Ordained PriestPriest
16 Jan 167339.0AppointedBishop of Tinos, Greece
29 Jan 167339.1Ordained BishopBishop of Tinos, Greece
169965.0DiedBishop of Tinos, Greece

MicroData Summary for Angelus Veniero (Venerius):
Bishop Angelus Veniero (Venerius) Bishop of Tinos

  • a priest for 40.8 years
  • a bishop for 25.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 367, and Page 380

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013