Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Lorenzo Cibo (Cybo)

Deceased

Bishop of Jesi, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Apr 1618Born
8 Aug 164931.2Ordained DeaconDeacon
10 Aug 164931.2Ordained PriestPriest
14 Dec 167153.6AppointedBishop of Jesi, Italy
3 Jan 167253.6Ordained BishopBishop of Jesi, Italy
18 Aug 168062.3DiedBishop of Jesi, Italy

MicroData Summary for Lorenzo Cibo (Cybo) (VIAF: 4560328)
Bishop Lorenzo Cibo (Cybo) (born , died ) Bishop of Jesi

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGenoa, Archdiocese of Genova
Ordained BishopSanta Maria in Vallicella, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceJesi, Diocese of Jesi
Buried Place (Original)Cathedral, Jesi, Diocese of Jesi

  • a priest for 31.0 years
  • a bishop for 8.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 71
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1672, Number 1
  • b/ob/c34: AT, 1 May 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 2 May 2018

Quantcast