Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Józef Marcelin Dzięcielski

Deceased

Bishop of Lublin


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
Mar 1768³BornTehórzów
18 Jun 179224.3Ordained PriestPriest
17 Dec 181951.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze), Poland
17 Dec 181951.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Arathia
5 Mar 182052.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Arathia
19 Dec 182557.8AppointedBishop of Lublin, Poland
14 Feb 183971.0DiedBishop of Lublin, Poland

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Józef Marcelin Dzięcielski:
Bishop Józef Marcelin Dzięcielski (died ) Bishop of Lublin

  • a priest for 46.7 years
  • a bishop for 18.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 85, and Page 243

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013