Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Camille-Antoine Chilouet, C.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Farafangana, Madagascar


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Jul 1899Born
11 Apr 192525.7Ordained DeaconDeacon of Congregation of the Mission
29 Jun 192525.9Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Mission
24 Dec 195758.4AppointedBishop of Farafangana, Madagascar
2 Jul 195858.9Ordained BishopBishop of Farafangana, Madagascar
25 Nov 197071.3DiedBishop of Farafangana, Madagascar

MicroData Summary for Camille-Antoine Chilouet
Bishop Camille-Antoine Chilouet C.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Farafangana

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMontluçon, Diocese of Moulins, France
Ordained DeaconSt-Joseph des Carmes of Catholic Institute, Chapel, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris, France
Ordained BishopLazarists Fathers, Chapel, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris, France
Death PlaceFarafangana, Diocese of Farafangana

  • a priest for 45.4 years
  • a bishop for 12.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • od/c0/loc: AJ, 3 Jul 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 12 Jul 2018

Quantcast