Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gabriel Champagne, M. Afr. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Tamale, Ghana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Apr 1908Born
29 Jun 193527.1Ordained PriestPriest of Missionaries of Africa (White Fathers)
12 Apr 195748.9AppointedBishop of Tamale, Ghana
9 Jun 195749.1Ordained BishopBishop of Tamale, Ghana
23 Jun 197264.1ResignedBishop of Tamale, Ghana
21 Dec 197668.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Tamale, Ghana

MicroData Summary for Gabriel Champagne
Bishop Gabriel Champagne M. Afr. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Tamale

EventPlace
Birth PlaceActon-Vale, Canada

  • a priest for 41.4 years
  • a bishop for 19.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 128

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast