Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John MacDonald

Deceased

Bishop of Aberdeen, Scotland, Great Britain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Jul 1818Born
Oct 1841³23.2Ordained DeaconDeacon of Northern District, Scotland, Great Britain
4 Nov 184123.3Ordained PriestPriest of Northern District, Scotland, Great Britain
11 Dec 186850.4AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Northern District, Scotland, Great Britain
11 Dec 186850.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Nicopolis ad Iaterum
23 Feb 186950.6SucceededVicar Apostolic of Northern District, Scotland, Great Britain
24 Feb 186950.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Nicopolis ad Iaterum
15 Mar 187859.7AppointedBishop of Aberdeen, Scotland, Great Britain
4 Feb 188970.5DiedBishop of Aberdeen, Scotland, Great Britain

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for John MacDonald (VIAF: 78286607)
Bishop John MacDonald (born , died ) Bishop of Aberdeen

EventPlace
Birth PlaceStrathglass, Inverness
Ordained BishopAssomption, Aberdeen, Diocese of Aberdeen, Scotland

  • a priest for 47.2 years
  • a bishop for 19.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • s/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 152, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 69, and Page 413
  • od/c01: CB, 17 Feb 2016
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1869, Number 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 19 Mar 2017