Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Joseph-Victor de Castellane-Adhémar

Deceased

Bishop of Senez


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Feb 1748BornMarseille
14 Dec 178335.8SelectedBishop of Senez, France
25 Jun 178436.3ConfirmedBishop of Senez, France
18 Jul 178436.4Ordained BishopBishop of Senez, France
7 Nov 178840.7DiedBishop of Senez, France

MicroData Summary for Jean-Joseph-Victor de Castellane-Adhémar:
Bishop Jean-Joseph-Victor de Castellane-Adhémar (born , died ) Bishop of Senez

  • a bishop for 4.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1784, Number 19
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 375

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.1, 31 Dec 2015; Data: 17 Jan 2016