Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Patrick Delany

Deceased

Archbishop of Hobart, Australia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Feb 1853Born
9 Nov 187926.7Ordained PriestPriest of Saint Paul and Minneapolis, Minnesota, USA
16 Jun 189340.3AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Hobart, Australia
16 Jun 189340.3AppointedTitular Archbishop of Laranda
10 Dec 189340.8Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Laranda
29 Dec 190754.9SucceededArchbishop of Hobart, Australia
7 May 192673.2DiedArchbishop of Hobart, Australia

MicroData Summary for Patrick Delany
Archbishop Patrick Delany (born , died ) Archbishop of Hobart

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTonacor, Diocese of Elphin, Ireland
Ordained BishopSt. Patrick, Cathedral, Ballarat, Diocese of Ballarat

  • a priest for 46.4 years
  • a bishop for 32.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • op/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 143
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 309, and Page 333
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1893, Number 70

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 30 May 2017