Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Hugh Conway

Deceased

Bishop of Killala


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Feb 1819BornBallyeroy
1842¹22.9Ordained PriestPriest
21 Nov 187152.8AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Killala, Ireland
21 Nov 187152.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Achantus
4 Feb 187253.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Achantus
9 Jun 187354.4SucceededBishop of Killala, Ireland
23 Apr 189374.2DiedBishop of Killala, Ireland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Hugh Conway:
Bishop Hugh Conway (born , died ) Bishop of Killala

  • a priest for 51.3 years
  • a bishop for 21.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 71, and Page 90

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013