Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Joseph O’Gorman, C.S.Sp. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Sierra Leone

Titular Bishop of Amastris


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 May 1866BornHacketstown, Ireland
8 Oct 188923.4Ordained PriestPriest
15 Aug 189024.3ProfessedPriest of Congregation of the Holy Spirit
14 Sep 190337.3AppointedVicar Apostolic of Sierra Leone
14 Sep 190337.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Amastris
28 Oct 190337.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Amastris
23 Sep 193266.4ResignedVicar Apostolic of Sierra Leone
13 Apr 193568.9DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Sierra Leone

MicroData Summary for John Joseph O’Gorman:
Bishop John Joseph O’Gorman C.S.Sp. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Sierra Leone

  • a priest for 45.5 years
  • a bishop for 31.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1931
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1933
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1936
  • op/ob: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1932
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 50
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1903, Number 50

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013