Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Walter Shanahan

Deceased

Bishop of Harrisburg, Pennsylvania, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Jan 1846Born
2 Jan 186922.9Ordained PriestPriest of Philadelphia, Pennsylvania, USA
7 Jan 189953.0AppointedBishop of Harrisburg, Pennsylvania, USA
1 May 189953.3Ordained BishopBishop of Harrisburg, Pennsylvania, USA
19 Feb 191670.1DiedBishop of Harrisburg, Pennsylvania, USA

MicroData Summary for John Walter Shanahan
Bishop John Walter Shanahan (born , died ) Bishop of Harrisburg

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSilver Lake, PA, Diocese of Philadelphia, Pennsylvania
Ordained BishopSts. Peter and Paul, Cathedral, Philadelphia, Archdiocese of Philadelphia, Pennsylvania

  • a priest for 47.1 years
  • a bishop for 16.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 299
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1899, Number 22

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast