Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gonzalo Alonso Calzada Guerrero

Bishop of Tehuacán, Puebla, México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Jul 1964 Born
18 May 198924.8Ordained PriestPriest of Celaya, Guanajuato, México
20 Nov 201248.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Antequera, Oaxaca, México
20 Nov 201248.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Cissa
5 Feb 201348.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cissa
20 Oct 201854.2AppointedBishop of Tehuacán, Puebla, México
4 Dec 201854.4InstalledBishop of Tehuacán, Puebla, México

MicroData Summary for Gonzalo Alonso Calzada Guerrero
Bishop Gonzalo Alonso Calzada Guerrero (born ) Bishop of Tehuacán

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSan Luis de la Paz
Ordained BishopAuditorio Guelaguetza, Oaxaca, Archdiocese of Antequera, Oaxaca

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Tehuacán.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 20 Nov 2012
  • ob: CB, 20 Nov 2012
  • c2+: CB, 31 Jan 2013
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 213, Number 17,654
  • ab: Bollettino, 20 Oct 2018
  • i: CB, 24 Oct 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 26 Oct 2018

Quantcast