Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Angelo Criscito

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Lucera, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Jan 1910Born
21 Jul 193525.5Ordained PriestPriest
27 Jun 197060.4AppointedBishop of Lucera, Italy
27 Jun 197060.4AppointedBishop of San Severo, Italy
9 Aug 197060.5Ordained BishopBishop of Lucera, Italy
7 Sep 198575.6RetiredBishop of Lucera, Italy
7 Sep 198575.6RetiredBishop of San Severo, Italy
20 Nov 198676.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Lucera, Italy

MicroData Summary for Angelo Criscito
Bishop Angelo Criscito (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Lucera

EventPlace
Birth PlaceConza
Ordained BishopConza della Campania

  • a priest for 51.3 years
  • a bishop for 16.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 11, Number 556

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Sep 2019

Quantcast