Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Baptiste-Marie Caffarelli

Deceased

Bishop of Saint-Brieuc


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Apr 1763BornFalga, Haute Garonne
1786¹22.7Ordained PriestPriest
12 Apr 180239.0SelectedBishop of Saint-Brieuc, France
29 Apr 180239.0ConfirmedBishop of Saint-Brieuc, France
1 May 180239.0Ordained BishopBishop of Saint-Brieuc, France
11 Jan 181551.7DiedBishop of Saint-Brieuc, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jean-Baptiste-Marie Caffarelli:
Bishop Jean-Baptiste-Marie Caffarelli (born , died ) Bishop of Saint-Brieuc

  • a priest for 29.0 years
  • a bishop for 12.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 118
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1802, Number 15

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015