Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Juan Bautista Cardinal Benlloch y Vivó

Deceased

Archbishop of Burgos

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Ara Coeli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Dec 1864BornValencia
25 Feb 188823.2Ordained PriestPriest of Valencia, Spain
12 Dec 190137.0AppointedApostolic Administrator of Solsona, Spain
12 Dec 190137.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Hermopolis Maior
2 Feb 190237.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Hermopolis Maior
6 Dec 190641.9AppointedBishop of Urgell, Spain
7 Jan 191954.0AppointedArchbishop of Burgos, Spain
7 Mar 192156.2Elevated to Cardinal
16 Jun 192156.5AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Ara Coeli
14 Feb 192661.1DiedArchbishop of Burgos, Spain

MicroData Summary for Juan Bautista Benlloch y Vivó:
Cardinal Juan Bautista Benlloch y Vivó (born , died ) Archbishop of Burgos

  • a priest for 38.0 years
  • a bishop for 24.0 years
  • a cardinal for 4.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 304
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1902, Number 8
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 96

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013