Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alfred Lanctôt, M. Afr. †

Deceased

Bishop of Rulenge


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Apr 1912BornSherbrooke, Canada
29 Jun 193624.2Ordained PriestPriest of Missionaries of Africa (White Fathers)
13 Dec 195139.7AppointedVicar Apostolic of Bukoba, Tanzania
13 Dec 195139.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Avensa
6 Mar 195239.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Avensa
25 Mar 195340.9AppointedBishop of Bukoba, Tanzania
21 Jun 196048.2AppointedBishop of Rulenge, Tanzania
30 May 196957.1DiedBishop of Rulenge, Tanzania

MicroData Summary for Alfred Lanctôt:
Bishop Alfred Lanctôt M. Afr. (born , died ) Bishop of Rulenge

  • a priest for 32.9 years
  • a bishop for 17.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1952, Number 15

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013