Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thomas John McDonnell

Deceased

Coadjutor Bishop of Wheeling, West Virginia, USA

Titular Bishop of Sela


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Aug 1894Born
20 Sep 191925.0Ordained PriestPriest of New York, New York, USA
2 Jul 194752.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of New York, New York, USA
2 Jul 194752.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Sela
15 Sep 194753.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sela
7 Mar 195156.5AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Wheeling, West Virginia, USA
25 Feb 196166.5DiedCoadjutor Bishop of Wheeling, West Virginia, USA

MicroData Summary for Thomas John McDonnell
Bishop Thomas John McDonnell (born , died ) Coadjutor Bishop of Wheeling

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNew York, Archdiocese of New York, New York
Ordained BishopSt. Patrick, Cathedral, New York, Archdiocese of New York, New York

  • a priest for 41.4 years
  • a bishop for 13.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1947, Number 92
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 71, Additions/Corrections (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast