Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luciano Bux

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Oppido Mamertina-Palmi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Jun 1936BornBari
2 Jul 196125.0Ordained PriestPriest of Bari (-Canosa), Italy
21 Jan 199558.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Bari-Bitonto, Italy
21 Jan 199558.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Aurusuliana
25 Mar 199558.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Aurusuliana
5 Feb 200063.6AppointedBishop of Oppido Mamertina-Palmi, Italy
2 Jul 201175.0RetiredBishop of Oppido Mamertina-Palmi, Italy
8 Aug 201478.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Oppido Mamertina-Palmi, Italy

MicroData Summary for Luciano Bux:
Bishop Luciano Bux (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Oppido Mamertina-Palmi

  • a priest for 53.1 years
  • a bishop for 19.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 2 Jul 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Number 12,501
  • d: CB, 8 Aug 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 9 Aug 2014