Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Leonardo Gregorio Gallardo Heredia

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of San Juan de Cuyo, Argentina

Titular Bishop of Areopolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Nov 1915Born
20 Sep 194125.8Ordained PriestPriest
13 Feb 196044.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of San Juan de Cuyo, Argentina
13 Feb 196044.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Areopolis
8 May 196044.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Areopolis
23 May 196145.4DiedAuxiliary Bishop of San Juan de Cuyo, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Leonardo Gregorio Gallardo Heredia
Bishop Leonardo Gregorio Gallardo Heredia (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of San Juan de Cuyo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOliva

  • a priest for 19.6 years
  • a bishop for 1.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1,960, Number 53

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast