Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Froilán Ferreira Reinafé

Deceased

Bishop of La Rioja, Argentina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Apr 1890Born
30 Oct 191323.5Ordained PriestPriest
13 Sep 193444.3AppointedBishop of La Rioja, Argentina
31 Mar 193544.9Ordained BishopBishop of La Rioja, Argentina
13 Apr 193544.9InstalledBishop of La Rioja, Argentina
22 Feb 196473.8DiedBishop of La Rioja, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Froilán Ferreira Reinafé
Bishop Froilán Ferreira Reinafé (born , died ) Bishop of La Rioja

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCórdoba

  • a priest for 50.3 years
  • a bishop for 28.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1,935, Number 23

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast